Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 526 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6280 Week
» 34238 Month
» 68880 Year
» 1290445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 58200 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Johnson
Class 2F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 03/1880
Withdrawal Thu 17/06/1954
Service Life 74 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
14B Kentish Town 4w/e 31/12/1950
33A Plaistow 4w/e 17/02/1951
33A Plaistow 5w/e 24/03/1951
   Withdrawn 17/06/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 09/02/1951
LOAN 33A Plaistow m/e 28/02/1951
WDN   17/06/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 58200    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
06/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 58200