Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2564 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15970 Week
» 68986 Month
» 188513 Year
» 3215366 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
58203 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
During 01/1880 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/01/1958 |
Service Life |
78 yrs , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58203 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58203 |
|
|