Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2935 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16341 Week
» 69357 Month
» 188884 Year
» 3215737 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
58268 |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
Sat 01/01/1880 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/10/1951 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
01/01/1880 |
18A |
|
Toton |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
06/10/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/10/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58268 |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58268 |
|
|
11/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|