Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19377 Week
» 72393 Month
» 191920 Year
» 3218773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
58285 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
Sat 01/01/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/06/1951 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8E |
Brunswick |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/06/1951 |
Derby Works |
New construction of class 5MT up to 73008, latter being frame only. 73005 in paint shop, others in course of construction. Diesels complete up to 12091, 12092 having motors on so far. Little change of stored engines. On works were 40546 an 41049, both damaged, 44102 (71H), 53810 (71G); 58285 (3B) for special examination. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58285 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
14/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58285 |
|
|