Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1361 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19164 Week
» 72180 Month
» 191707 Year
» 3218560 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2097 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
British Railways |
41915 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Whitelegg |
Class |
2P |
Company History |
LTSR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1951 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1900 |
13C |
|
Tilbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
18A |
|
Toton |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
13A |
|
Plaistow |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
04/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
13C |
Tilbury |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
13A |
Plaistow |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1949 |
Devons Road MPD |
Engines stored here are Nos. 2097, 41923/41, 41951 (with 2133 numberplate), 41968/76, 2100/07/21. No. 43828, just off Bow Works, was painted plain black without lettering on the tender. |
SLS/194909 |
25/03/1950 |
Devons Road MPD |
In the Works' roads were: Nos. 40532 (ex Works), 43607, 44370, also Nos. 41939/51 (lined out and ? stored), 41928/29/41/45/66/68/76/77 an 2097. The crane tank-No. 58865-was in the shed and four 0-6-OT's were in evidence: Nos. M27510, 58853/58/61. |
SLS/195005 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2097 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tilbury (13C) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 41915 but not taken up |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (13A) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2097 |
|
|
04/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|