Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4199 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17605 Week
» 70621 Month
» 190148 Year
» 3217001 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2102 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
British Railways |
41920 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Whitelegg |
Class |
2P |
Company History |
LTSR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1949 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1900 |
18C |
|
Hasland |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
16A |
|
Nottingham |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
18C |
|
Hasland |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
18C |
Hasland |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2102 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hasland (18C) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 41920 but not taken up |
|
|
1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2102 |
|
|