Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4097 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18140 Week
» 83094 Month
» 285758 Year
» 3312611 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2104 |
m/e |
06/1903 |
British Railways |
41922 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
06/10/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/03/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1953 |
Former LTSR class extinct |
The withdrawal of the 4-4-2T 2093 (41911) and 41922, formerly L.T. & S.R• 52 Wennington and 63 Mansion House renders this class extinct. |
SLS/195306 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2104 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41922 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41922 |
|
|