Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 768 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4284 Week
» 32242 Month
» 66884 Year
» 1288449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1208 m/e 12/1946
BR 41208 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service w/e Fri 28/12/1946 to Kentish Town (14B)
Withdrawal Fri 02/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 18 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
14B Kentish Town (New) w/e 28/12/1946
14B Kentish Town 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
22A Bristol Barrow Road m/e 16/06/1956
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
83F Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 28/12/1963
83D Exmouth Junction w/e 15/11/1964
83G Templecombe (S&D) w/e 22/11/1964
   Withdrawn 02/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 19/11/1949
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/11/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 83F Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 31/12/1963
TOSTORE   3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction w/e 09/11/1964
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 2w/e 28/11/1964
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   02/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1946 To Service To service as LMS Number 1208
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 41208    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (83F)    
15/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
22/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 41208    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston