Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1134 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5708 Week
» 33666 Month
» 68308 Year
» 1289873 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41224   16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 16/10/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 18 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6K Rhyl 4w/e 19/04/1952
8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 26/02/1955
3E Monument Lane 4w/e 21/05/1955
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 24/03/1956
1C Watford 4w/e 14/06/1958
14E Bedford w/e 24/10/1959
15A Wellingborough w/e 17/03/1962
71A Eastleigh w/e 05/01/1963
72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 06/04/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 7w/e 22/06/1964
70A Nine Elms m/e 12/10/1964
70F Bournemouth w/e 20/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 7B Bangor w/e 16/10/1948
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 1C Watford 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 14E Bedford 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 14E Bedford 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region w/e 05/01/1963
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 07/01/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 01/04/1963
LOAN 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 06/04/1963
TOSTORE Barnstaple   2w/e 16/05/1964
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 3w/e 29/06/1964
TOSTORE   3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 12/10/1964
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 2w/e 20/11/1964
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 41224
Built at Crewe Works
   
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
24/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (14E)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 41224    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev