Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 816 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4676 Week
» 7258 Month
» 271891 Year
» 1493456 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41228 on 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Tue 30/10/1948
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 15 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 30/10/1948
2A Rugby w/e 15/11/1958
84D Leamington 4w/e 29/11/1958
2A Rugby w/e 06/02/1960
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 06/08/1960
24J Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 12/11/1960
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 18/02/1961
15C Leicester Midland w/e 30/09/1961
15B Wellingborough w/e 08/02/1964
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/04/1964
15B Wellingborough 4w/e 27/04/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 2E Warwick w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 29/11/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 27/12/1958
EXLOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 27/08/1960
LOAN 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 15B Wellingborough 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 27/04/1964
LOAN 5B Crewe South 4w/e 02/05/1964
EXLOAN 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 28/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/09/1958 Leamington Spa - Weedon Leamington Spa - Weedon branch last day, 13th September. 41227(2C) worked the 2-30 p.m. ex Weedon (from bay platform), 41228 (2C) the 2-57 p.m. ex-Leamington (the last through up train) and returned with the 6-14 p.m. ex-Northampton as last down train and 41218(2E) worked the 6-30 p.m. ex-Leamington to Napton returning empty stock in front of last train. SLS/195810
17/11/1958 Shed Closures Coventry, Hunstanton and Warwick sheds closed w.e.f. 17th, 3rd and 17th November respectively. Of the Warwick locos. 41227/8/85, 42566 an 48018 have been transferred to Leamington (GW) 84D. SLS/195812
27/12/1958 Warwick MPD Further to a recent note, 41227/8/85 an 42566 were officially transferred to W.R. 13th December, 1958, but on 20th December 42566 was transferred back to Rugby and its daily parcels turn was worked (from 22nd December) by 82031 (84G) until 9th January when Fowler 2-6-4T 42388 (87K-Swansea) appeared on this duty. SLS/195902
13/06/1959 Leamington Spa Former G.W. Railcars W13/4 are now allocated as parcels cars-they have seating removed. Three Ivatt 2-6-2Ts are still here viz. 41228/78/85 and relieve 42566 (when necessary) on the Nuneaton parcels roster. SLS/195909
31/10/1959 Leamington Spa The parcels rail-cars have recently been out of action and the replacement trains have been worked by 42566 (still with 2C plate !) which has worked over GW metals as far as Wolverhampton LL and Stourbridge June., being so noted in January. 42566's regular working to Nuneaton was taken over by 41228 (with 41285 as spare engine). SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41228
Built at Crewe Works
   
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
06/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
18/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
30/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
08/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
27/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
27/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41228    

prev prev