Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 462 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6216 Week
» 34174 Month
» 68816 Year
» 1290381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41232 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 08/1949
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/08/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965
Service Life 16 yrs , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 08/10/1955
6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
84H Wellington 4w/e 27/02/1960
2L Leamington w/e 08/02/1964
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 14/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 21/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 27/08/1949
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 2L Leamington 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 21/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 41232
Built at Crewe Works
   
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
08/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 41232    

prev prev