Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 691 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4207 Week
» 32165 Month
» 66807 Year
» 1288372 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41238 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1949
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 15 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 09/08/1952
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 24/06/1961
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/05/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 2D Nuneaton w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 06/07/1961
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 8w/e 22/06/1964
WDN   w/e 25/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 41238
Built at Crewe Works
   
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
25/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 41238    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev