Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 13 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6859 Week
» 18406 Month
» 418088 Year
» 494675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41241   09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1949
Withdrawal During 12/1966
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 12/06/1958
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 04/10/1958
84H Wellington 4w/e 31/10/1959
2L Leamington w/e 01/02/1964
2M Wellington w/e 13/06/1964
6H Bangor w/e 20/06/1964
6C Croes Newydd w/e 25/07/1964
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 12/06/1965
10G Skipton w/e 21/08/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 2L Leamington 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 10G Skipton 5w/e 11/09/1965
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 41241
Built at Crewe Works
   
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
08/04/1962 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 5/1962 Link
01/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (2M)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41241    

prev prev