Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 388 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7458 Week
» 4566 Month
» 111512 Year
» 1333077 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41249 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 11/1949
Withdrawal 3w/e Sat 12/03/1966
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 16 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
71H Templecombe (S&D) 8w/e 20/07/1953
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 24/01/1959
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
83F Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 28/12/1963
83D Exmouth Junction w/e 22/11/1964
83G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 13/06/1965
83G Templecombe (S&D) 5w/e 20/02/1966
   Withdrawn 3w/e 12/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 14A Cricklewood East w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 19/11/1949
LOAN 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 71H Templecombe (S&D) 6w/e 20/07/1953
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 83F Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 31/12/1963
TOSTORE   3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 2w/e 28/11/1964
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 13/06/1965
TOSTORE   7w/e 16/01/1966
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 5w/e 20/02/1966
WDN   3w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 41249
Built at Crewe Works
   
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (71H)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (83F)    
22/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
20/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41249    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev