Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 766 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4282 Week
» 32240 Month
» 66882 Year
» 1288447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41284 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 11/1950 to Wakefield (25A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/03/1967
Scrapping During 09/1967
Service Life 16 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25A Wakefield (New) m/e 11/1950
27B Aintree 4w/e 06/10/1951
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 01/12/1956
24G Skipton 4w/e 18/05/1957
14D Neasden w/e 07/02/1959
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 24/06/1961
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) m/e 12/10/1964
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 17/10/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 19/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 25A Wakefield w/e 11/11/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 24G Skipton 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 06/07/1961
TOSTORE   3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 12/10/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 17/10/1966
WDN   w/e 19/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1950 To Service To service as BR Number 41284
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Wakefield (25A)
   
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (24G)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G)    
17/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 41284    

prev prev