Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 807 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4667 Week
» 7249 Month
» 271882 Year
» 1493447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41285 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 11/1950 to Crewe North (5A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/12/1966
Scrapping During 05/1967
Service Life 16 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5A Crewe North (New) m/e 11/1950
10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 31/12/1950
6K Rhyl 8w/e 11/07/1953
2C Warwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
2A Rugby w/e 15/11/1958
84D Leamington 4w/e 29/11/1958
84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 08/08/1959
84D Leamington 4w/e 30/01/1960
2A Rugby w/e 19/03/1960
84D Leamington w/e 28/05/1960
89D Oswestry w/e 20/07/1963
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 18/07/1964
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 02/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 18/11/1950
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 1C Watford 4w/e 25/02/1956
EXLOAN 2C Warwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 29/11/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 08/08/1959
LOAN 84D Leamington 4w/e 30/01/1960
EXLOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 26/03/1960
LOAN 84D Leamington 4w/e 21/05/1960
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1962
ALLOC 89D Oswestry 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 5w/e 09/01/1965
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/11/1958 Shed Closures Coventry, Hunstanton and Warwick sheds closed w.e.f. 17th, 3rd and 17th November respectively. Of the Warwick locos. 41227/8/85, 42566 an 48018 have been transferred to Leamington (GW) 84D. SLS/195812
27/12/1958 Warwick MPD Further to a recent note, 41227/8/85 an 42566 were officially transferred to W.R. 13th December, 1958, but on 20th December 42566 was transferred back to Rugby and its daily parcels turn was worked (from 22nd December) by 82031 (84G) until 9th January when Fowler 2-6-4T 42388 (87K-Swansea) appeared on this duty. SLS/195902
13/06/1959 Last trains The locomotives on last trains on 13th June were as follows - 46496 (Cambridge-Kettering), 46467 ( Kettering-Cambridge), 41227 (Rugby-Leamington)), 41285 (Leamington- Rugby), 58065 (Southwell, then light engine to Lincoln), 84007 (Higham Ferrers). SLS/195907
13/06/1959 Leamington Spa Former G.W. Railcars W13/4 are now allocated as parcels cars-they have seating removed. Three Ivatt 2-6-2Ts are still here viz. 41228/78/85 and relieve 42566 (when necessary) on the Nuneaton parcels roster. SLS/195909
31/10/1959 Leamington Spa The parcels rail-cars have recently been out of action and the replacement trains have been worked by 42566 (still with 2C plate !) which has worked over GW metals as far as Wolverhampton LL and Stourbridge June., being so noted in January. 42566's regular working to Nuneaton was taken over by 41228 (with 41285 as spare engine). SLS/196003
31/10/1962 Leamington MPD 41285 has returned from Tyseley after repair; standard class 4 75000 worked the thrice daily Nuneaton parcels turn whilst 41285 was away. 'King' 6016 is still lying here. SLS/196212
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41285
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Crewe North (5A)
   
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (84K)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
19/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
28/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89D)    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
02/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41285    

prev prev