Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 788 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4304 Week
» 32262 Month
» 66904 Year
» 1288469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41296 m/e 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 10/1951
Withdrawal 3w/e Sat 12/03/1966
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 14 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 20/08/1954
73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 11/03/1955
72E Barnstaple Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956
71J Highbridge 6w/e 01/04/1957
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 16/05/1959
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
83G Templecombe (S&D) 6w/e 19/09/1965
83G Templecombe (S&D) 5w/e 20/02/1966
   Withdrawn 3w/e 12/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
LOAN 75E Three Bridges w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 20/08/1954
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 11/03/1955
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction P 31/10/1956
ALLOC 71J Highbridge 9w/e 01/04/1957
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 10/09/1960
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/06/1965
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 5w/e 19/09/1965
TOSTORE   7w/e 16/01/1966
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 5w/e 20/02/1966
WDN   3w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 41296
Built at Crewe Works
   
20/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
01/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Highbridge (71J)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
20/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41296    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev