Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 195 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6402 Week
» 3915 Month
» 231799 Year
» 1453364 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41297 m/e 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 10/1951
Withdrawal Sat 05/10/1963
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 12 yrs , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1951
75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 14/02/1953
75E Three Bridges 8w/e 20/07/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 21/06/1955
72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 10/10/1955
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963
71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn 05/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane w/e 06/12/1951
LOAN 75E Three Bridges w/e 06/12/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 01/04/1963
LOAN 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 08/09/1963
WDN   05/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/10/1951 Brighton Works New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. SLS/195112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41297
Built at Crewe Works
   
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
05/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 41297    

prev prev