Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 286 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7356 Week
» 4464 Month
» 111410 Year
» 1332975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41302 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 03/1952 to Bricklayers Arms (73B)
Withdrawal 5w/e Sat 02/11/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963
Service Life 11 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73B Bricklayers Arms (New) m/e 03/1952
72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 25/01/1957
83D Laira 4w/e 01/06/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn 5w/e 02/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 5w/e 25/01/1957
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 41302
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)
   
25/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 41302    

prev prev