Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 791 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5392 Week
» 16939 Month
» 416621 Year
» 493208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41312   05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 05/1952 to Faversham (73E)
Withdrawal During 07/1967
Service Life 15 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73E Faversham (New) 05/1952
73F Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959
72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 09/02/1960
75A Brighton 4w/e 01/04/1963
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/05/1964
70A Nine Elms 5w/e 17/04/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73F Ashford P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 75A Brighton 3w/e 01/04/1963
LOAN 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 8w/e 22/06/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 17/04/1967
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 41312
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Faversham (73E)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
25/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
17/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 41312    

prev prev