Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 267 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7337 Week
» 4445 Month
» 111391 Year
» 1332956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41315 m/e 05/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 05/1952 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 12 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction (New) m/e 05/1952
72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 30/06/1952
72D Plymouth Friary 5w/e 14/02/1953
83D Laira 4w/e 01/06/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/09/1963
70E Salisbury m/e 02/03/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 24/02/1964
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 02/03/1964
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 41315
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
02/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41315    

prev prev