Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 714 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4230 Week
» 32188 Month
» 66830 Year
» 1288395 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41317 m/e 06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 06/1952 to Eastbourne (75G)
Withdrawal 3w/e Sat 19/12/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 12 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
75G Eastbourne (New) m/e 06/1952
75F Tunbridge Wells West 8w/e 07/10/1952
74A Ashford 6w/e 21/06/1955
72D Plymouth Friary 9w/e 12/06/1957
83D Laira 4w/e 01/06/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn 3w/e 19/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 74A Ashford 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 24/02/1958
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   3w/e 19/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 41317
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Eastbourne (75G)
   
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (74A)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41317    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev