Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 659 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4175 Week
» 32133 Month
» 66775 Year
» 1288340 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41318 m/e 06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 06/1952 to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)
Withdrawal During 10/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 11 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) m/e 06/1952
75F Tunbridge Wells West 9w/e 30/06/1952
74B Ramsgate 6w/e 15/06/1956
72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 12/06/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 11/06/1957
WDN   4w/e 29/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 41318
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)
   
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 41318    

prev prev