Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 30 Online
» 1083 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5657 Week
» 33615 Month
» 68257 Year
» 1289822 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41320 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 01/1952 to Crewe North (5A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 15 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5A Crewe North (New) m/e 01/1952
1C Watford 4w/e 22/03/1952
5A Crewe North 8w/e 14/06/1952
6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/07/1952
5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1952
6H Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955
3E Monument Lane 4w/e 21/05/1955
1C Watford 4w/e 24/03/1956
3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 10/08/1957
2A Rugby 4w/e 07/09/1957
1C Watford 4w/e 30/11/1957
2E Northampton 4w/e 22/02/1958
15A Wellingborough w/e 05/09/1959
16D Annesley w/e 19/12/1959
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 16/09/1961
70E Salisbury m/e 20/07/1964
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 10/05/1965
70A Nine Elms 5w/e 17/04/1967
70F Bournemouth 4w/e 15/05/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 02/02/1952
LOAN 1C Watford 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1952
LOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 08/08/1953
EXLOAN 5A Crewe North 4w/e 08/08/1953
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 20/03/1954
EXLOAN 5A Crewe North 4w/e 17/04/1954
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 15/05/1954
EXLOAN 5A Crewe North 4w/e 12/06/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 1C Watford 4w/e 24/03/1956
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 10/08/1957
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 2w/e 12/08/1957
EXLOAN 2A Rugby 2w/e 12/08/1957
LOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 07/09/1957
EXLOAN 1C Watford 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 22/02/1958
LOAN 15A Wellingborough 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 20/07/1964
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 10/05/1965
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 17/04/1967
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 15/05/1967
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 41320
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe North (5A)
   
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
10/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
17/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
15/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 41320    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev