Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 185 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1284 Week
» 7418 Month
» 235302 Year
» 1456867 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 41321 m/e 02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 02/1952 to Warrington Dallam (8B)
Withdrawal Fri 02/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 13 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
8B Warrington Dallam (New) m/e 02/1952
6H Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955
6K Rhyl 8w/e 16/07/1955
6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 05/11/1955
2C Warwick 4w/e 11/08/1956
2A Rugby w/e 15/11/1958
9G Gorton w/e 22/11/1958
15C Leicester Midland w/e 30/01/1960
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn 02/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 09/02/1952
LOAN 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 15/05/1954
EXLOAN 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 12/06/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 30/09/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   02/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/01/1961 Market Harborough MPD The sub shed of Leicester is supplied with two engines for its two turns viz. Welham shunt (Class 4F) and Ivatt 2-6-2T for Seaton workings; 41321 has been working this latter turn and leaves shed at 7-05 a.m. for Seaton. Locomotives on shed on 29th January were 41321, 43949, 44242/9, 44716, 46445, 48010/36/529/671 an 90554. SLS/196103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41321
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)
   
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
02/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 41321    

prev prev