Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 306 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5275 Week
» 17788 Month
» 105980 Year
» 990361 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 21   01/1904
BR 30021   06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal During 03/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 60 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C Guildford 4w/e 09/09/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
72B Salisbury 2w/e 10/10/1961
75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 30/01/1963
70E Salisbury 4w/e 22/07/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HOR Horsham 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 16/09/1955
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 19/12/1955
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 22/07/1963
WDN   w/e 15/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 21
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30021    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30021    

prev