Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 301 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5270 Week
» 17783 Month
» 105975 Year
» 990356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 22   01/1899
BR 30022   08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal During 05/1958
Scrapping During 05/1958
Service Life 59 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B Redhill 4w/e 10/12/1953
70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 30/12/1953
70C Guildford 4w/e 08/02/1954
70F Fratton 6w/e 21/06/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70E Reading (S.R.) 10w/e 10/12/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 70F Fratton 4w/e 04/06/1955
WDN   w/e 17/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 22
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30022    
10/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
30/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (70F)    
05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 30022    

prev prev