Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 23 m/e 01/1899
BR 30023 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal Sat 07/10/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 62 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BPL Barnstaple Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 20/03/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
71D Fratton 6w/e 27/03/1953
71D Fratton 4w/e 26/05/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953
72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
   Withdrawn 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 71D Fratton 3w/e 27/03/1953
REINS 71D Fratton 9w/e 26/05/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72B Salisbury P 31/10/1956
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
WDN   w/e 07/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 23
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barnstaple Junction (BPL)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30023    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
07/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30023    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Scrap yard - intact. SLS 1/1962 Link

prev prev