Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 834 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 834 Week
» 21816 Month
» 163770 Year
» 1048151 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 24 m/e 01/1899
BR 30024 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/03/1963
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 64 yrs, 2 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 03/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 19/11/1962
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth w/e 30/01/1963
WDN   w/e 03/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 24
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30024    
20/07/1954 Sightings Eastleigh Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
03/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30024    

prev prev