Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 577 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 577 Week
» 18898 Month
» 107090 Year
» 991471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 25 m/e 02/1899
BR 30025 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 02/1899
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Scrapping During 10/1964
Service Life 65 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 3w/e 17/11/1956
71B Bournemouth 3w/e 30/01/1963
70E Salisbury m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction P 02/01/1948
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 10/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 25
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30025    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30025    

prev prev