Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 27 m/e 01/1904
BR 30027 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal During 11/1959
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 55 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FRA Fratton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C Guildford 4w/e 11/04/1951
72A Exmouth Junction w/e 11/03/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HOR Horsham 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 11/03/1959
WDN   w/e 21/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 27
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30027    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30027    

prev prev