Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 28 m/e 01/1904
BR 30028 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/09/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 58 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70C Guildford 7w/e 27/06/1951
75E Three Bridges 6w/e 21/06/1955
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 15/06/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 29/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 29/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 28
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30028    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
29/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30028    

prev prev