Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 64 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 64 Week
» 18385 Month
» 106577 Year
» 990958 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 29   02/1904
BR 30029   11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Scrapping During 10/1964
Service Life 60 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ELH Eastleigh 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 30/01/1963
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
70F Bournemouth m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh w/e 21/06/1955
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 17/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 29
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30029    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30029    

prev prev