Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 36 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5468 Week
» 17289 Month
» 186061 Year
» 1070442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 30 m/e 02/1904
BR 30030 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/10/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 55 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 19/03/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 17/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh w/e 21/06/1955
WDN   w/e 17/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 30
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30030    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30030    

prev prev