Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 301 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5270 Week
» 17783 Month
» 105975 Year
» 990356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 32   03/1898
BR 30032   04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1898
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Scrapping During 06/1964
Service Life 65 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70B Feltham w/e 11/03/1959
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction P 02/01/1948
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 70B Feltham q/e 12/01/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 01/04/1963
WDN   w/e 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 32
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30032    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
01/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30032    

prev prev