Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 306 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5275 Week
» 17788 Month
» 105980 Year
» 990361 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 33   04/1898
BR 30033   01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 04/1898
Withdrawal Sat 22/12/1962
Scrapping During 04/1963
Service Life 64 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72E Barnstaple Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
72B Salisbury 6w/e 05/10/1960
   Withdrawn 22/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 6w/e 05/10/1960
WDN   22/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 33
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30033    
16/07/1954 Sightings Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
22/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30033    

prev prev