Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 34   04/1898
BR 30034   07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 04/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sun 17/02/1963
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 64 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 20/03/1951
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 30/07/1962
72B Salisbury 4w/e 24/09/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 17/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 72D Plymouth Friary w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 30/07/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region m/e 31/08/1962
ALLOC 72B Salisbury 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70E Salisbury w/e 30/01/1963
WDN   w/e 17/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 34
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
07/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 30034    
30/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
17/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30034    

prev prev