Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 839 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 839 Week
» 21821 Month
» 163775 Year
» 1048156 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 35 m/e 04/1898
BR 30035 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 04/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sun 17/02/1963
Scrapping During 06/1964
Service Life 64 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PLY Plymouth Friary 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 6w/e 09/02/1960
70A Nine Elms 8w/e 17/01/1961
70B Feltham m/e 10/02/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 17/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 72D Plymouth Friary w/e 13/06/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region m/e 29/02/1960
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70B Feltham w/e 30/01/1963
WDN   w/e 17/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 35
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30035    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
17/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30035    

prev prev