Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 397 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5366 Week
» 17879 Month
» 106071 Year
» 990452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 36   05/1898
BR 30036   09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1898
Withdrawal During 01/1964
Scrapping During 08/1964
Service Life 65 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BPL Barnstaple Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 20/03/1951
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 12/05/1951
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 30/07/1962
71B Bournemouth 3w/e 30/01/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 08/02/1954
REINS 72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 08/02/1955
TOSTORE 72D Plymouth Friary w/e 13/06/1955
REINS 72D Plymouth Friary 5w/e 12/08/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 30/07/1962
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region m/e 31/08/1962
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   w/e 12/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 36
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barnstaple Junction (BPL)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30036    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
30/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 30036    

prev prev