Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 36 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 5468 Week
» 17289 Month
» 186061 Year
» 1070442 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 37 m/e 05/1898
BR 30037 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1898
Withdrawal Sat 31/05/1958
Scrapping During 06/1958
Service Life 60 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 31/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/08/1948
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE   5w/e 24/08/1953
REINS 72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 18/11/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 37
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30037    
05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 30037    

prev prev