Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 38 m/e 05/1898
BR 30038 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1898
Withdrawal During 02/1958
Scrapping During 03/1958
Service Life 59 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70B Feltham 4w/e 11/04/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 70B Feltham 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 70B Feltham 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 01/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 38
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30038    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
02/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 30038    

prev prev