Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 62 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 62 Week
» 18383 Month
» 106575 Year
» 990956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 39   05/1898
BR 30039   09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1898
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963
Scrapping During 05/1963
Service Life 64 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Stored (Exmouth Junction) 4w/e 17/06/1950
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/09/1950
72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 20/03/1951
72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 12/05/1951
70F Fratton 6w/e 21/06/1955
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 05/04/1960
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 24/06/1950
TOSTORE   5w/e 31/07/1950
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 09/10/1950
REINS 72C Yeovil Town 6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 72D Plymouth Friary 9w/e 31/10/1954
TOSTORE 72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 08/02/1955
ALLOC 70F Fratton 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 05/04/1960
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 39
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30039    
17/06/1950 To Store To Store at Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (70F)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 30039    

prev prev