Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 573 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 573 Week
» 18894 Month
» 107086 Year
» 991467 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 40 m/e 06/1898
BR 30040 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 06/1898
Withdrawal During 06/1961
Scrapping During 06/1961
Service Life 63 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 27/06/1951
72D Plymouth Friary 8w/e 07/10/1952
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 21/06/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 04/06/1955
WDN   w/e 10/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1898 To Service To service as SR Number 40
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30040    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30040    

prev prev