Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 65 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 65 Week
» 18386 Month
» 106578 Year
» 990959 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 41   03/1899
BR 30041   08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1899
Withdrawal During 08/1957
Scrapping During 09/1957
Service Life 58 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
70B Feltham 6w/e 18/06/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 70B Feltham 6w/e 22/06/1954
WDN   w/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 41
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30041    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 30041    

prev prev