Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 225 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 225 Week
» 18546 Month
» 106738 Year
» 991119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 42   03/1899
BR 30042 y/e 1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1899
Withdrawal During 06/1957
Scrapping During 06/1957
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BPL Barnstaple Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70B Feltham 6w/e 18/06/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE   5w/e 24/08/1953
REINS 75A Brighton 6w/e 18/11/1953
ALLOC 70B Feltham 6w/e 22/06/1954
WDN   w/e 08/06/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 42
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barnstaple Junction (BPL)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 30042    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
06/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 30042    

prev prev