Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 284 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3523 Week
» 16036 Month
» 104228 Year
» 988609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 43   03/1899
BR 30043   10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1899
Withdrawal During 05/1961
Scrapping During 07/1961
Service Life 62 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC FEL Feltham 4w/e 06/10/1948
TOSTORE 70B Feltham 9w/e 31/10/1954
REINS 70B Feltham 4w/e 11/12/1954
TOSTORE 70B Feltham 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 70B Feltham 4w/e 11/03/1955
WDN   w/e 03/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 43
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30043    
05/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30043    

prev prev