Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 44 m/e 03/1899
BR 30044 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 03/1899
Withdrawal During 09/1961
Scrapping During 10/1961
Service Life 62 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BPL Barnstaple Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 26/05/1953
TOSTORE   5w/e 24/08/1953
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 10w/e 10/12/1953
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 22/06/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1899 To Service To service as SR Number 44
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barnstaple Junction (BPL)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30044    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30044    

prev prev