Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 905 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1805 Week
» 13626 Month
» 182398 Year
» 1066779 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 45 m/e 05/1905
BR 30045 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/12/1962
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 57 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FRA Fratton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 08/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 08/10/1951
WDN   w/e 08/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 45
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30045    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
08/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30045    

prev prev