Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 46 m/e 05/1905
BR 30046 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal During 02/1959
Scrapping During 04/1959
Service Life 53 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72D Plymouth Friary 4w/e 13/04/1951
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 10/10/1955
TOSTORE 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 19/12/1955
REINS 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/06/1956
WDN   w/e 07/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 46
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30046    
02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 30046    

prev prev