Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 306 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5275 Week
» 17788 Month
» 105980 Year
» 990361 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 47   05/1905
BR 30047   08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Drummond
Class Motor Tanks
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal During 02/1960
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 54 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BM Bournemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HOR Horsham 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959
WDN   w/e 06/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 47
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30047    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 30047    

prev prev